NY S01000 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that when the state central register of child abuse and maltreatment receives a report by means of a telephone call from a physician, registered nurse or registered physician's assistant or from a social worker or psychologist, or by a law enforcement official, such telephone calls shall not be screened by the hotline but shall be immediately transmitted to the appropriate child protective service for investigation; provides for the child protective service of each county to establish procedures for communication and cooperation with local hospitals and law enforcement to better protect the interests of at risk children and to better provide essential services to their families.
Title
Provides that when the state central register of child abuse and maltreatment receives a report by means of a telephone call from a physician, registered nurse or registered physician's assistant or from a social worker or psychologist, or by a law enforcement official, such telephone calls shall not be screened by the hotline but shall be immediately transmitted to the appropriate child protective service for investigation; provides for the child protective service of each county to establish procedures for communication and cooperation with local hospitals and law enforcement to better protect the interests of at risk children and to better provide essential services to their families.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-09 - Senate - Senate Children and Families Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate Children and Families Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-09 - Senate - Senate Children and Families Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate Children and Families Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-05-14 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-05-09 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-05-08 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1091 |
2018-01-09 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | referred to children and families |
2017-05-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-05-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-05-01 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-04-26 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.606 |
2017-02-07 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2017-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
Same As/Similar To
A00825 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to children and families