NY S01033 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-13 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5159B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-13 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5159B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides a tax check off box on personal income tax return forms for gifts for the life pass it on trust fund for gifts for organ and tissue donation outreach and research and provides for certain reporting requirements for such fund.
Title
Provides a tax check off box on personal income tax return forms for gifts for the life pass it on trust fund for gifts for organ and tissue donation outreach and research and provides for certain reporting requirements for such fund.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-13 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A5159B |
2018-06-13 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1744 |
2018-06-13 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-06-13 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1033A |
2018-06-13 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2017-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A05159 (Same As) 2018-08-24 - signed chap.215