NY S01151 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES
Pending: Senate Social Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES
Pending: Senate Social Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to a cost of living adjustment for designated human services for the purpose of establishing rates of payments; extends certain provisions; excludes food and energy.
Title
Relates to a cost of living adjustment for designated human services for the purpose of establishing rates of payments; extends certain provisions; excludes food and energy.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Ortt [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-02 - Senate - Senate Social Services Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES |
2017-03-02 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2017-02-08 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1151A |
2017-02-08 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO SOCIAL SERVICES |
2017-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES |
Same As/Similar To
A04891 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to mental health