NY S01288 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the city of New York from increasing property taxes where a property's assessed value has decreased in the previous year; applies only to class one and class two properties.
Title
Prohibits the city of New York from increasing property taxes where a property's assessed value has decreased in the previous year; applies only to class one and class two properties.
Sponsors
Sen. Tony Avella [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-20 - Senate - Senate Cities Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - Senate Cities Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - Senate Cities Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-03-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-03-21 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.695 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2017-06-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-02-07 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-02-06 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-01-31 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.105 |
2017-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES |
Same As/Similar To
A01324 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to real property taxation