NY S01421 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-02 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-02 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes veterans who served in combat during Operation Iraqi Freedom after March 20, 2003 to receive extra credit on competitive examinations.
Title
Authorizes veterans who served in combat during Operation Iraqi Freedom after March 20, 2003 to receive extra credit on competitive examinations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-02 | RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN | |
2009-01-30 | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
Same As/Similar To
S02770 (Same As) 2010-01-06 - REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS
A06302 (Same As) 2010-01-06 - referred to governmental employees
A06302 (Same As) 2010-01-06 - referred to governmental employees