NY S01440 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - PRINT NUMBER 1440B
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - PRINT NUMBER 1440B
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extends from November 30, 2020 to November 30, 2023, the authorization granted to the county of Schuyler to impose an additional one percent of sales and compensating use taxes.
Title
Extends from November 30, 2020 to November 30, 2023, the authorization granted to the county of Schuyler to impose an additional one percent of sales and compensating use taxes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1440B |
2020-03-10 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2020-01-27 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1440A |
2020-01-27 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2019-01-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A09705 (Same As) 2020-03-06 - print number 9705a