NY S01502 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-06 - PRINT NUMBER 1502A
Pending: Senate Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-06 - PRINT NUMBER 1502A
Pending: Senate Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the idling of any passenger vehicle, with certain exceptions, for more than 3 consecutive minutes; first violation is a warning, second violations of such section are traffic infractions punishable by a fine of $150.
Title
Prohibits the idling of any passenger vehicle, with certain exceptions, for more than 3 consecutive minutes; first violation is a warning, second violations of such section are traffic infractions punishable by a fine of $150.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-06 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1502A |
2018-02-06 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2017-01-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A00923 (Same As) 2018-02-05 - amended on third reading 923a