NY S01544 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-02 - referred to correction
Pending: Assembly Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-02 - referred to correction
Pending: Assembly Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes the failure of a sex offender to register or verify pursuant to the provisions of the sex offender registration act or violation of the prohibition on sex offenders being employed on a motor vehicle engaged in the retail sale of frozen desserts a class D felony.
Title
Makes the failure of a sex offender to register or verify pursuant to the provisions of the sex offender registration act or violation of the prohibition on sex offenders being employed on a motor vehicle engaged in the retail sale of frozen desserts a class D felony.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-02 | Assembly | referred to correction |
2012-05-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-05-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-04-25 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2012-04-19 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2012-04-18 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.542 |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2011-06-14 | Assembly | referred to correction |
2011-06-14 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-06-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-06-07 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2011-06-06 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2011-06-02 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.977 |
2011-01-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |