NY S01567 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-26 - PRINT NUMBER 1567A
Pending: Senate Cities 1 Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-26 - PRINT NUMBER 1567A
Pending: Senate Cities 1 Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the city of New York to conduct an analysis of stormwater and groundwater issues in southeast Queens.
Title
Directs the city of New York to conduct an analysis of stormwater and groundwater issues in southeast Queens.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-26 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1567A |
2022-01-26 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CITIES 1 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES 1 |
2021-06-10 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-02-08 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-02-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-02-02 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.270 |
2021-01-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES 1 |
Same As/Similar To
A06170 (Same As) 2022-02-15 - REFERRED TO CITIES 1