NY A06170 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - REFERRED TO CITIES 1
Pending: Senate Cities 1 Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - REFERRED TO CITIES 1
Pending: Senate Cities 1 Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the city of New York to conduct an analysis of stormwater and groundwater issues in southeast Queens.
Title
Directs the city of New York to conduct an analysis of stormwater and groundwater issues in southeast Queens.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Cities Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Cities Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES 1 |
2022-02-15 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-02-15 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-01-20 | Assembly | amended on third reading 6170a |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.204 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-01-05 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2021-06-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.200 |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | rules report cal.200 |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | reported |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-03-10 | Assembly | referred to cities |
Same As/Similar To
S01567 (Same As) 2022-01-26 - PRINT NUMBER 1567A