NY S01592 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-12 - COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-12 - COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Eliminates statutory authority of social services official to receive and dispose of a deed, mortgage, or lien.
Title
Eliminates statutory authority of social services official to receive and dispose of a deed, mortgage, or lien.
Sponsors
Sen. Liz Krueger [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-12 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2012-02-21 | Senate | NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
2011-01-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |