NY S01592 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-29 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-29 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prevents housing discrimination against victims of domestic violence.
Title
Prevents housing discrimination against victims of domestic violence.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Grisanti [R] | Sen. Ruth Hassell-Thompson [D] | Sen. Timothy Kennedy [D] | Sen. Liz Krueger [D] |
Sen. Velmanette Montgomery [D] | Sen. Kevin Parker [D] | Sen. Bill Perkins [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-29 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2013-05-21 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2013-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A02039 (Same As) 2014-01-15 - enacting clause stricken
A08903 (Same As) 2014-02-28 - referred to governmental operations
A08903 (Same As) 2014-02-28 - referred to governmental operations