NY S01714 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-23 - SIGNED CHAP.324
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-23 - SIGNED CHAP.324
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends provisions which authorize the town of Islip to lease certain lands to a business corporation.
Title
Extends provisions which authorize the town of Islip to lease certain lands to a business corporation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-08-23 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.324 |
2023-08-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | home rule request |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.684 |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | substituted for a2818 |
2023-03-30 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2023-03-29 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-03-29 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-03-29 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2023-03-23 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-03-22 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-03-21 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.549 |
2023-01-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A02818 (Same As) 2023-06-08 - substituted by s1714