NY S01728 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-17 - referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-17 - referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires translation services for orders of protection to any person who is not fluent in English.
Title
Requires translation services for orders of protection to any person who is not fluent in English.
Sponsors
Sen. Adriano Espaillat [D] | Sen. Brad Hoylman-Sigal [D] | Sen. Liz Krueger [D] | Sen. Velmanette Montgomery [D] |
Sen. Bill Perkins [D] | Sen. Gustavo Rivera [D] | Sen. John Sampson [D] | Sen. Daniel Squadron [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-17 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2014-06-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-11 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 1728C |
2014-06-02 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 1728B |
2014-02-11 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-02-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.107 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2013-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2013-06-10 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2013-06-05 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2013-06-04 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1014 |
2013-04-10 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1728A |
2013-04-10 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY |
2013-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A01084 (Same As) 2014-01-14 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY