NY S01738 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-27 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-27 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes an assumption of the inadmissibility of evidence of a defendant's creative or artistic expression against such defendant in a criminal proceeding; requires the proffering party to affirmatively prove that the evidence is admissible by clear and convincing evidence.
Title
Establishes an assumption of the inadmissibility of evidence of a defendant's creative or artistic expression against such defendant in a criminal proceeding; requires the proffering party to affirmatively prove that the evidence is admissible by clear and convincing evidence.
Sponsors
Sen. Brad Hoylman-Sigal [D] | Sen. Jamaal Bailey [D] | Sen. Zellnor Myrie [D] | Sen. Julia Salazar [D] |
Sen. Luis Sepulveda [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-01 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-01 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-27 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2024-03-27 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-03-27 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-01-24 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-01-23 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-01-22 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.158 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2023-05-15 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2023-05-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-05-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-05-09 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-05-08 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-05-03 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.742 |
2023-01-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A00127 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to codes