NY S01793 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-3)
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-15 - referred to agriculture
Pending: Assembly Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-15 - referred to agriculture
Pending: Assembly Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the beginning farmer revolving loan program.
Title
Relates to the beginning farmer revolving loan program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-15 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
2016-06-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-07 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-06-06 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-06-02 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1384 |
2016-05-10 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2015-06-10 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2015-06-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-08 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2015-06-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1261 |
2015-05-05 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2015-01-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
Same As/Similar To
A04352 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - referred to agriculture