NY S01806 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-13 - SIGNED CHAP.151
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-13 - SIGNED CHAP.151
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to requiring certain municipalities to display the prisoner of war and missing in action flag.
Title
Relates to requiring certain municipalities to display the prisoner of war and missing in action flag.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Ortt [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-13 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.151 |
2015-08-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2015-03-09 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2015-03-09 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-03-09 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.57 |
2015-03-09 | Assembly | substituted for a867 |
2015-02-10 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2015-02-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-02-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-01-21 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.32 |
2015-01-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A00867 (Same As) 2015-03-09 - substituted by s1806