NY S01870 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-13 - COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires orders of protection and temporary orders of protection issued in family court or in cases of family offenses in criminal court or in matrimonial actions to be translated by an interpreter into the native language of the parties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires orders of protection and temporary orders of protection issued in family court or in cases of family offenses in criminal court or in matrimonial actions to be translated by an interpreter into the native language of the parties.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-13SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2012-03-13SenateNOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED
2012-01-19SenatePRINT NUMBER 1870A
2012-01-19SenateAMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY
2012-01-04SenateREFERRED TO JUDICIARY
2011-06-07SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2011-01-13SenateREFERRED TO JUDICIARY

Same As/Similar To

A06113 (Same As) 2012-03-21 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback