NY S01876 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-11 - referred to local governments
Pending: Assembly Local Governments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-11 - referred to local governments
Pending: Assembly Local Governments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows for two or more counties to enter into a contract for the provision of a county jail.
Title
Allows for two or more counties to enter into a contract for the provision of a county jail.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-11 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2014-06-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-10 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1233 |
2014-06-10 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2014-05-14 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2013-06-03 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2013-06-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-06-03 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-05-23 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2013-05-22 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2013-05-21 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.648 |
2013-05-13 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1876A |
2013-05-13 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2013-03-19 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2013-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A01193 (Same As) 2014-01-08 - referred to correction