NY S01880 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-22 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6324B
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-22 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6324B
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes penalties for licensed barbers who sell alcohol to persons under the age of twenty-one years, including the loss of barbering license.
Title
Establishes penalties for licensed barbers who sell alcohol to persons under the age of twenty-one years, including the loss of barbering license.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-22 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A6324B |
2011-06-21 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 1880B |
2011-06-21 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2011-06-21 | Senate | returned to senate |
2011-06-21 | Assembly | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2011-06-17 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2011-06-17 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-06-17 | Senate | REPASSED SENATE |
2011-06-13 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 1880A |
2011-06-13 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2011-06-10 | Senate | returned to senate |
2011-06-10 | Assembly | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2011-06-06 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
2011-06-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-06-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-03-16 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2011-03-15 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2011-03-14 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.220 |
2011-02-23 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO ALCOHOLISM AND DRUG ABUSE |
2011-01-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A06324 (Same As) 2011-08-17 - signed chap.417