NY S01966 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-12 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-12 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the state board of parole to provide notification to victims upon the conditional release of an inmate convicted of a crime against a member of the same family or household.
Title
Requires the state board of parole to provide notification to victims upon the conditional release of an inmate convicted of a crime against a member of the same family or household.
Sponsors
Sen. Carl Marcellino [R] | Sen. Martin Golden [R] | Sen. Owen Johnson [R] | Sen. William Larkin [R] |
Sen. George Maziarz [R] | Sen. Catharine Young [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-12 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2012-06-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-06-12 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-06-12 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1180 |
2012-06-12 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2012-03-07 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2011-06-14 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2011-06-14 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-06-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-06-14 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1204 |
2011-06-13 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2011-05-24 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1966A |
2011-05-24 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2011-05-03 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2011-01-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A09656 (Same As) 2012-03-22 - referred to governmental operations