NY S02004 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the use of campaign funds to pay attorney's fees or any costs for the actual defense of a candidate, public or party official, members of their immediate family or domestic partner in connection with a criminal action, investigation, or prosecution; and restricts use of such funds for costs related to certain civil actions.
Title
Prohibits the use of campaign funds to pay attorney's fees or any costs for the actual defense of a candidate, public or party official, members of their immediate family or domestic partner in connection with a criminal action, investigation, or prosecution; and restricts use of such funds for costs related to certain civil actions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2019-06-10 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2004B |
2019-06-10 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ELECTIONS |
2019-06-07 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2004A |
2019-06-07 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ELECTIONS |
2019-01-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A02536 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to election law