NY S02039 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-29 - SIGNED CHAP.200
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-29 - SIGNED CHAP.200
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to registration fees and continuing education requirements for license renewal.
Title
Relates to registration fees and continuing education requirements for license renewal.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-29 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.200 |
2019-08-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.160 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | substituted for a7124 |
2019-02-04 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2019-02-04 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-02-04 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-01-22 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.41 |
2019-01-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A07124 (Same As) 2019-08-29 - SIGNED CHAP.200