NY S02071 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to judgments of parentage for children conceived through assisted reproduction or pursuant to surrogacy agreements; restricts genetic surrogate parenting contracts; regulates surrogacy programs; repeals provisions relating to the legitimacy of children born by artificial insemination.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to judgments of parentage for children conceived through assisted reproduction or pursuant to surrogacy agreements; restricts genetic surrogate parenting contracts; regulates surrogacy programs; repeals provisions relating to the legitimacy of children born by artificial insemination.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-11Assemblyreferred to codes
2019-06-11SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-11SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-11SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1238
2019-06-11SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2019-06-08SenatePRINT NUMBER 2071B
2019-06-08SenateAMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY
2019-05-14SenatePRINT NUMBER 2071A
2019-05-14SenateAMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY
2019-01-22SenateREFERRED TO JUDICIARY

Same As/Similar To

A01071 (Same As) 2019-06-10 - print number 1071c

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback