NY S02158 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-19 - referred to children and families
Pending: Assembly Children and Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-19 - referred to children and families
Pending: Assembly Children and Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires certain persons and officials to report child abuse or suspected child abuse to law enforcement authorities.
Title
Requires certain persons and officials to report child abuse or suspected child abuse to law enforcement authorities.
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Serino [R] | Sen. Fred Akshar [R] | Sen. Patrick Gallivan [R] | Sen. Pamela Helming [R] |
Sen. Christopher Jacobs [R] | Sen. Kathleen Marchione [R] | Sen. Michael Ranzenhofer [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate Children and Families Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate Children and Families Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate Children and Families Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate Children and Families Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-19 | Assembly | referred to children and families |
2018-06-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-11 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 2158C |
2018-05-31 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-05-30 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-05-30 | Senate | AMENDED (T) 2158B |
2018-05-22 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1334 |
2018-01-30 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
2017-05-10 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2158A |
2017-05-10 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2017-03-01 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2017-01-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
Same As/Similar To
A11161 (Same As) 2018-06-12 - referred to children and families