NY S02189 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-15 - referred to veterans' affairs
Pending: Assembly Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-15 - referred to veterans' affairs
Pending: Assembly Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the performance of a study regarding homeless persons who are veterans in the state of New York.
Title
Relates to the performance of a study regarding homeless persons who are veterans in the state of New York.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-15 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-15 | Assembly | referred to veterans' affairs |
2018-05-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-05-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-05-15 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1174 |
2018-05-15 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-03-19 | Senate | NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2017-01-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
Same As/Similar To
A01646 (Same As) 2018-05-15 - REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS