NY A01646 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 49-10)
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-15 - REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS
Pending: Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-15 - REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS
Pending: Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the performance of a study regarding homeless persons who are veterans in the state of New York.
Title
Relates to the performance of a study regarding homeless persons who are veterans in the state of New York.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Assembly Veterans' Affairs Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Assembly Veterans' Affairs Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2018-05-15 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-05-15 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-05-10 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.859 |
2018-05-08 | Assembly | reported |
2018-04-24 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-04-17 | Assembly | print number 1646a |
2018-04-17 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to veterans' affairs |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to veterans' affairs |
2017-01-12 | Assembly | referred to veterans' affairs |
Same As/Similar To
S02189 (Same As) 2018-05-15 - referred to veterans' affairs
S08521 (Same As) 2018-05-15 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
S08521 (Same As) 2018-05-15 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN