NY S02329 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the board of elections or a bipartisan committee appointed by such board to conduct a risk-limiting audit of voter verifiable audit records from voting machines or systems within the jurisdiction of such board.
Title
Requires the board of elections or a bipartisan committee appointed by such board to conduct a risk-limiting audit of voter verifiable audit records from voting machines or systems within the jurisdiction of such board.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2019-06-14 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2329A |
2019-06-14 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2019-05-21 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-01-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |