NY S02412 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Passed on August 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-21 - APPROVAL MEMO.2
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes the commission on prosecutorial conduct.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes the commission on prosecutorial conduct.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-21AssemblyAPPROVAL MEMO.2
2018-08-21AssemblySIGNED CHAP.202
2018-08-08SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2018-06-19Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-06-19Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-19Assemblyordered to third reading cal.376
2018-06-19Assemblysubstituted for a5285c
2018-06-14Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2018-06-14SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-14SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-14SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1783
2018-06-14SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2018-03-06SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2018-01-12SenatePRINT NUMBER 2412D
2018-01-12SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY
2018-01-03SenateREFERRED TO JUDICIARY
2017-06-15SenatePRINT NUMBER 2412C
2017-06-15SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE
2017-05-23SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2017-05-09SenatePRINT NUMBER 2412B
2017-05-09SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY
2017-01-26SenatePRINT NUMBER 2412A
2017-01-26SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY
2017-01-13SenateREFERRED TO JUDICIARY

Same As/Similar To

A05285 (Same As) 2018-06-19 - substituted by s2412d

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S02412&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S02412&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S02412
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S02412&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S02412A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S02412&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S02412B
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S02412&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S02412C
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S02412&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S02412D
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S2412#SC1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S2412#SC2
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S2412#SF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S2412#SC3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S02412&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback