NY S02482 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT
Pending: Senate Housing, Construction, and Community Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT
Pending: Senate Housing, Construction, and Community Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to penalties for owners of property who fail to file a proper or timely rent registration statement.
Title
Relates to penalties for owners of property who fail to file a proper or timely rent registration statement.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2023-06-10 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2023-02-27 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-02-27 | Senate | AMENDED 2482A |
2023-02-15 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-02-14 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.369 |
2023-01-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A00106 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.7