NY S02509 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-08 - REFERRED TO LABOR
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-08 - REFERRED TO LABOR
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the entitlement to unpaid leave of absence for victims of domestic violence; permits victims of domestic violence to take an unpaid leave of absence for ninety days from employment to address on-going domestic violence; defines "address on-going domestic violence"; contains provision to protect the individual's job position and benefits.
Title
Relates to the entitlement to unpaid leave of absence for victims of domestic violence; permits victims of domestic violence to take an unpaid leave of absence for ninety days from employment to address on-going domestic violence; defines "address on-going domestic violence"; contains provision to protect the individual's job position and benefits.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
2013-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2013-04-17 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2013-04-16 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2013-04-15 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.280 |
2013-01-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
Same As/Similar To
A07029 (Same As) 2014-01-08 - referred to labor