NY S02565 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A249C
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A249C
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes identification cards for individuals with developmental disabilities.
Title
Establishes identification cards for individuals with developmental disabilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - Senate - Senate Mental Health And Developmental Disabilities Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Senate - Senate Mental Health And Developmental Disabilities Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - Senate - Senate Mental Health And Developmental Disabilities Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Senate - Senate Mental Health And Developmental Disabilities Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A249C |
2018-05-31 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-05-30 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-05-22 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1336 |
2018-01-17 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES |
2017-05-24 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2565C |
2017-05-24 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2017-05-16 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2017-05-05 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2565B |
2017-05-05 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES |
2017-05-03 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2565A |
2017-05-03 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES |
2017-01-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES |
Same As/Similar To
A00249 (Same As) 2018-08-24 - signed chap.209