NY S02620 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the seizure and forfeiture of vehicles, vessels and aircraft used in counterfeit goods.
Title
Provides for the seizure and forfeiture of vehicles, vessels and aircraft used in counterfeit goods.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-05-08 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2017-05-08 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-05-08 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-03-23 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-03-22 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.494 |
2017-01-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A05072 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to codes