NY S02634 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-12 - SIGNED CHAP.631
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-12 - SIGNED CHAP.631
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to authority of certain municipalities to levy an excise tax on the sale of tobacco products other than cigarettes; relates to warrants issued pursuant to the administrative code of the city of New York.
Title
Relates to authority of certain municipalities to levy an excise tax on the sale of tobacco products other than cigarettes; relates to warrants issued pursuant to the administrative code of the city of New York.
Sponsors
Sen. Liz Krueger [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 104 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-12 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.631 |
2019-12-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.274 |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted for a6369 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-19 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1757 |
2019-06-19 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-01-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A06369 (Same As) 2019-12-12 - SIGNED CHAP.631