NY S02649 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-16 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-16 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes a group of businesses that are regulated by a state agency or a representative of such businesses to petition the state agency for alternate methods for implementing a regulatory mandate that restricts the conducting or management of business in this state.
Title
Authorizes a group of businesses that are regulated by a state agency or a representative of such businesses to petition the state agency for alternate methods for implementing a regulatory mandate that restricts the conducting or management of business in this state.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-16 | Senate | RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN |
2018-05-14 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-05-09 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-05-08 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1080 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |
2017-01-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |