NY S02729 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-11 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-11 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to prohibiting retail establishments including food-service establishments from refusing to accept payment in cash; provides a civil penalty will be assessed for such actions.
Title
Relates to prohibiting retail establishments including food-service establishments from refusing to accept payment in cash; provides a civil penalty will be assessed for such actions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-11 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-03-06 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-03-05 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.578 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2023-06-06 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
2023-06-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-06-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-02-14 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-02-13 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-02-08 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.329 |
2023-01-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A00476 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to consumer affairs and protection