NY S02746 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-21 - APPROVAL MEMO.16
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the use of local cost data when adjusting claims; requires an insurer and independent adjuster to adjust certain claims made under an insurance policy that provides coverage for loss of or damage to property using cost data appropriate for the region of this state where the loss or damage occurred.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the use of local cost data when adjusting claims; requires an insurer and independent adjuster to adjust certain claims made under an insurance policy that provides coverage for loss of or damage to property using cost data appropriate for the region of this state where the loss or damage occurred.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 114 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-21AssemblyAPPROVAL MEMO.16
2018-12-21AssemblySIGNED CHAP.458
2018-12-12SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2018-06-20Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading cal.59
2018-06-20Assemblysubstituted for a808
2018-06-20Assemblyreferred to codes
2018-06-20SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-20SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-18SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1822
2018-06-18SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2018-01-03SenateREFERRED TO INSURANCE
2017-06-21SenateRECOMMITTED TO RULES
2017-06-14SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1617
2017-06-14SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2017-01-17SenateREFERRED TO INSURANCE

Same As/Similar To

A00808 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - substituted by s2746

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback