NY S02783 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-04 - REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT
Pending: Senate Housing, Construction, and Community Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-04 - REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT
Pending: Senate Housing, Construction, and Community Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to rent regulation; relates to recovery of certain housing accommodations by a landlord; relates to the declaration of emergencies for certain rental housing accommodations; extends certain provisions of law relating to rent regulation; relates to the adjustment of maximum allowable rent; relates to vacancy decontrol; relates to extending the length of time over which major capital improvement expenses may be recovered.
Title
Relates to rent regulation; relates to recovery of certain housing accommodations by a landlord; relates to the declaration of emergencies for certain rental housing accommodations; extends certain provisions of law relating to rent regulation; relates to the adjustment of maximum allowable rent; relates to vacancy decontrol; relates to extending the length of time over which major capital improvement expenses may be recovered.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2011-02-17 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2783A |
2011-02-17 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2011-02-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A02674 (Same As) 2012-01-18 - committed to housing