NY S02807 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 31 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-31 - SIGNED CHAP.57
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 31 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-31 - SIGNED CHAP.57
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extends numerous provisions of law that were set to expire and be repealed, but that were otherwise necessary for the fiscal stability of the state and the health and safety of its citizens; authorizes the governor to close correctional facilities; relates to the public safety communications surcharge; relates to annual reports of costs related to the statewide wireless network; removes the salary provision of state liquor authority commissioners, other than the chairman; relates to self-insurers for workers' compensation purposes; relates to removing the salary provision for civil service commissioners other than the president; provides aid and incentives for municipalities; relates to aid to municipalities in which a video lottery terminal facility is located; creates citizens empowerment tax credits, local government citizens re-organization empowerment grants and the local government performance and efficiency program; streamlines the local government efficiency grant program; clarifies the state's obligation to make payments with respect to certain lands; allows the State University Downstate Medical Center to create a not-for-profit corporation; relates to New York state district attorney and indigent legal services attorney loan forgiveness program eligibility; and relates to the acquisition of the assets of Community-General Hospital of Greater Syracuse of SUNY Upstate Medical University.
Title
Extends numerous provisions of law that were set to expire and be repealed, but that were otherwise necessary for the fiscal stability of the state and the health and safety of its citizens; authorizes the governor to close correctional facilities; relates to the public safety communications surcharge; relates to annual reports of costs related to the statewide wireless network; removes the salary provision of state liquor authority commissioners, other than the chairman; relates to self-insurers for workers' compensation purposes; relates to removing the salary provision for civil service commissioners other than the president; provides aid and incentives for municipalities; relates to aid to municipalities in which a video lottery terminal facility is located; creates citizens empowerment tax credits, local government citizens re-organization empowerment grants and the local government performance and efficiency program; streamlines the local government efficiency grant program; clarifies the state's obligation to make payments with respect to certain lands; allows the State University Downstate Medical Center to create a not-for-profit corporation; relates to New York state district attorney and indigent legal services attorney loan forgiveness program eligibility; and relates to the acquisition of the assets of Community-General Hospital of Greater Syracuse of SUNY Upstate Medical University.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-31 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.57 |
2011-03-30 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2011-03-30 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2011-03-30 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2011-03-30 | Assembly | message of necessity - 3 day message |
2011-03-30 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.14 |
2011-03-30 | Assembly | substituted for a4007c |
2011-03-30 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2011-03-30 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-03-30 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-03-30 | Senate | MESSAGE OF NECESSITY |
2011-03-30 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.284 |
2011-03-30 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2807C |
2011-03-30 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2011-03-12 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2807B |
2011-03-12 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2011-02-25 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2807A |
2011-02-25 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2011-02-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A04007 (Same As) 2011-03-30 - substituted by s2807c