NY S02844 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-26 - NOTICE OF PETITION - REQUESTED
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-26 - NOTICE OF PETITION - REQUESTED
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "reproductive health act"; provides a fundamental right to choose contraception and the right of a female to determine the course of a pregnancy; authorizes abortion prior to viability; defines terms; decriminalizes abortion.
Title
Enacts the "reproductive health act"; provides a fundamental right to choose contraception and the right of a female to determine the course of a pregnancy; authorizes abortion prior to viability; defines terms; decriminalizes abortion.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-26 | Senate | NOTICE OF PETITION - REQUESTED |
2012-03-12 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2012-02-23 | Senate | NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2011-02-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A06112 (Same As) 2012-01-04 - referred to health