NY S02845 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-09 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-09 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits an owner from adjusting the amount of preferential rent, rent charged and paid by the tenant which is less than the legal regulated rent for the housing accommodation, upon the renewal of a lease; only allows the owner to make such adjustments upon a vacancy which is not the result of the failure of the owner to maintain a habitable residence.
Title
Prohibits an owner from adjusting the amount of preferential rent, rent charged and paid by the tenant which is less than the legal regulated rent for the housing accommodation, upon the renewal of a lease; only allows the owner to make such adjustments upon a vacancy which is not the result of the failure of the owner to maintain a habitable residence.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-09 | Senate | RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2019-02-07 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2845A |
2019-02-07 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2019-01-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A04349 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to housing