NY S02859 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - returned to senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to authorizing the town of Smithtown, county of Suffolk, to alienate and convey certain parcels of land used as parklands to facilitate the placement and operation of a sewer pump station.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to authorizing the town of Smithtown, county of Suffolk, to alienate and convey certain parcels of land used as parklands to facilitate the placement and operation of a sewer pump station.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-04Assemblyreturned to senate
2019-06-04Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-04Assemblyhome rule request
2019-06-04Assemblyhome rule request
2019-06-04Assemblyordered to third reading cal.522
2019-06-04Assemblysubstituted for a5716
2019-05-30Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2019-05-30SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-05-30SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-03-06SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-03-05Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-03-04Senate1ST REPORT CAL.205
2019-01-30SenateREFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT

Same As/Similar To

A05716 (Same As) 2019-06-04 - substituted by s2859

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback