NY S02907 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the licensing of vision impairment specialists.
Title
Provides for the licensing of vision impairment specialists.
Sponsors
Sen. Roxanne Persaud [D] | Sen. Joseph Griffo [R] | Sen. Patrick Gallivan [R] | Sen. Pamela Helming [R] |
Sen. Robert Jackson [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2023-03-09 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2023-03-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-03-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-02-27 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-02-15 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-02-14 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.375 |
2023-01-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A03060 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to higher education