NY S03054 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-07 - SIGNED CHAP.218
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-07 - SIGNED CHAP.218
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Academy Charter School to submit an application for real property tax exemption to the assessor of the county of Nassau.
Title
Authorizes the Academy Charter School to submit an application for real property tax exemption to the assessor of the county of Nassau.
Sponsors
Sen. Kemp Hannon [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 111 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 111 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-07 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.218 |
2014-08-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.614 |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | substituted for a10020 |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2014-06-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-10 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1235 |
2014-06-10 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2013-05-08 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2013-05-08 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-05-08 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-04-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2013-04-17 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.328 |
2013-01-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A10020 (Same As) 2014-06-19 - substituted by s3054