NY S03185 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-12 - PRINT NUMBER 3185B
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-12 - PRINT NUMBER 3185B
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the imposition of a mandatory fine upon certain public officials convicted of a designated felony offense related to his or her official duties; establishes the offense of abuse of public trust crime.
Title
Provides for the imposition of a mandatory fine upon certain public officials convicted of a designated felony offense related to his or her official duties; establishes the offense of abuse of public trust crime.
Sponsors
Sen. Martin Golden [R] | Sen. Joseph Griffo [R] | Sen. Greg Ball [R] | Sen. Timothy Kennedy [D] |
Sen. Liz Krueger [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-12 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3185B |
2012-01-12 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CODES |
2012-01-12 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO CODES |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2011-04-06 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3185A |
2011-04-06 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2011-02-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A05049 (Same As) 2012-03-05 - print number 5049b