NY S03238 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-10 - PRINT NUMBER 3238A
Pending: Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-10 - PRINT NUMBER 3238A
Pending: Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the power authority of the state of New York to provide low-cost electric power to Broadway, off-Broadway and off-off-Broadway theaters for a limited period of time.
Title
Authorizes the power authority of the state of New York to provide low-cost electric power to Broadway, off-Broadway and off-off-Broadway theaters for a limited period of time.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-10 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3238A |
2014-02-10 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2013-01-31 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A00665 (Same As) 2014-01-30 - print number 665a