NY S03247 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on December 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-12 - SIGNED CHAP.633
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on December 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-12 - SIGNED CHAP.633
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes certain law enforcement officers and firefighters to possess and administer epinephrine by use of an epinephrine auto-injector device.
Title
Authorizes certain law enforcement officers and firefighters to possess and administer epinephrine by use of an epinephrine auto-injector device.
Sponsors
Sen. Julia Salazar [D] | Sen. James Tedisco [R] | Sen. Alessandra Biaggi [D] | Sen. Philip Boyle [R] |
Sen. David Carlucci [D] | Sen. Daphne Jordan [R] | Sen. Todd Kaminsky [D] | Sen. Jen Metzger [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-12 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.633 |
2019-12-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.19 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | substituted for a1024b |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | referred to health |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-14 | Senate | REPASSED SENATE |
2019-06-11 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 3247B |
2019-06-11 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2019-06-10 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-10 | Assembly | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | referred to health |
2019-05-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-13 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 3247A |
2019-02-26 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-02-12 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.146 |
2019-02-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A01024 (Same As) 2019-12-12 - SIGNED CHAP.633