NY S03250 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-17 - SIGNED CHAP.463
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-17 - SIGNED CHAP.463
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Syracuse regional airport authority.
Title
Creates the Syracuse regional airport authority.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 128 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-05-25 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-05-25 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-17 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.463 |
2011-08-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2011-06-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2011-06-06 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2011-06-06 | Assembly | home rule request |
2011-06-06 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.41 |
2011-06-06 | Assembly | substituted for a2166a |
2011-05-25 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2011-05-25 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-05-25 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-05-25 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2011-05-24 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2011-05-23 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2011-05-18 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.766 |
2011-05-05 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3250A |
2011-05-05 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2011-02-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A02166 (Same As) 2011-06-06 - substituted by s3250a