NY S03467 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-17 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-17 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a leave of absence for veterans on Veterans Day, November 11th.
Title
Establishes a leave of absence for veterans on Veterans Day, November 11th.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-17 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2016-02-01 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-01-26 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-01-25 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.61 |
2016-01-15 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3467A |
2016-01-15 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2015-06-25 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2015-05-06 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2015-05-05 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2015-05-04 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.504 |
2015-02-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
Same As/Similar To
A06324 (Same As) 2016-01-19 - print number 6324a