NY A06324 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-19 - print number 6324a
Pending: Assembly Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes a leave of absence for veterans on Veterans Day, November 11th.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes a leave of absence for veterans on Veterans Day, November 11th.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-01-19Assemblyprint number 6324a
2016-01-19Assemblyamend and recommit to labor
2016-01-06Assemblyreferred to labor
2015-03-20Assemblyreferred to labor

Same As/Similar To

S03467 (Same As) 2016-06-17 - COMMITTED TO RULES

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback